Global patent index - EP 1044898 A3

EP 1044898 A3 2000-10-25 - Method and device for waste disposal

Title (en)

Method and device for waste disposal

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Müllentsorgung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispostif d'élimination des déchets

Publication

EP 1044898 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00108391 A

Priority

DE 19917376 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1044898A2] The refuse collection method uses a refuse collection vehicle (3) which has a read head (8) for scanning an identification element (2), e.g. a semiconductor chip, incorporated in a refuse container as the latter is emptied, for identifying the user of the refuse container, with the refuse emptied from the container being weighed. The user identification and the weight data are supplied to a controller (14) of a personal computer (12) via a software databus (11). An INDEPENDENT DEVICE for a refuse collection device is also included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/14 (2006.01); B65F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1484 (2013.01); B65F 2003/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044898 A2 20001018; EP 1044898 A3 20001025; DE 19917376 A1 20001026

INPADOC legal status

2007-11-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1033570

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021101

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI