Global Patent Index - EP 1044899 A1

EP 1044899 A1 2000-10-18 - Waste container with pneumatically raised lid

Title (en)

Waste container with pneumatically raised lid

Title (de)

Müllbehälter mit pneumatisch hebbarem Deckel

Title (fr)

Poubelle avec couvercle élevée pneumatiquement

Publication

EP 1044899 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201297 A

Priority

CH 69699 A

Abstract (en)

A container is described (10) with a lid for collecting waste in which the aforementioned lid (6) is opened by moving a lever (1) connected to a rod (5) that moves vertically to rotate the lid (6) to which it is connected at one end, in which between the aforementioned lever (1) and the aforementioned rod (5) a pneumatic system is positioned (2, 12, 3, 8, 4, 9) that is supplied with pressure by the lever (1) and which pushes the aforementioned rod (5) to push it upwards, the aforementioned system comprises a flow-regulating valve (3) with differential action in both directions that is calibrated in such a way that the upward movement (S) of the rod (5) to open the lid (6) brought about by depressing the lever (1) occurs in less time than the downward movement (S) of the rod (5) that is pushed in the opposite direction by the weight of the lid (6) being closed again through the force of gravity. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/163 (2013.01); B65F 2001/1661 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044899 A1 20001018; CH 693988 A5 20040528

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011122

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI