Global Patent Index - EP 1044908 A1

EP 1044908 A1 2000-10-18 - Method for positionning plate-shaped products in a feeding station of a treatment machine and device for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for positionning plate-shaped products in a feeding station of a treatment machine and device for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Positionieren von plattenförmigen Gegenständen in der Zuführstation einer Verarbeitungsmaschine und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de positionnement d'éléments en plaque dans la station d'introduction d'une machine de traitement et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 1044908 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00105172 A

Priority

CH 67199 A

Abstract (en)

Method comprises attaching sheet (5) with clamps (16, 22) on tray (14); and controlling actuators (50, 60) to move tray forw or aside depending on readings from optoelectronic means. When sheet is placed in clamps (12) at predetermined position, clamps 22) are released, and tray moves back to its original position. An Independent claim is also included for the positioning apparatus.

Abstract (fr)

Le procédé de positionnement d'éléments en plaque (5), dans la station d'introduction d'une machine de traitement comprenant un dispositif de transport composé par une ou plusieurs barres (10) de pinces (12) d'entraînement de l'élément en plaque (5) dans des stations ultérieures, consiste, à partir d'une tablette (14) en position arrière de départ, à enclencher des moyens de fixation (16,22) d'un élément en plaque (5) sur la tablette (14), puis à commander des actuateurs (40, 50, 60) pour avancer la tablette (14) en avant et si nécessaire de côté et/ou de travers en fonction des lectures des coordonnées de positionnement de l'élément en plaque (5) par des moyens optoélectroniques, lectures effectuées lors de l'avance de la tablette (14) de telle sorte à amener et finalement arrêter le bord avant de l'élément en plaque (5) dans les pinces (12) du dispositif de transport en une position prédéterminée, à relâcher les moyens de fixation (16, 22), puis à ramener la tablette (14) en position arrière de départ. Le dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé comprend une tablette (14) munie de moyens de fixation temporaires (16,22) de l'élément en plaque (5), présentant un bord avant échancré (17) de manière complémentaire aux pinces (12) de la barre (10) d'entraînement, entraînée par des actuateurs (40, 50, 60), des moyens optoélectroniques de lecture du bord avant et/ou latéral et/ou d'un signe distinctif d'un traitement préalable de l'élément en plaque agencés peu en avant de la position de départ de la tablette et des moyens électroniques de commande pour piloter les actuateurs de la tablette (14) en fonction du cycle de la machine et des résultats des lectures des coordonnées de positionnement de l'élément en plaque (5) par les moyens optoélectroniques. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/10; B65H 7/08; B65H 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/05 (2006.01); B41F 21/12 (2006.01); B41F 21/14 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01); B65H 5/08 (2006.01); B65H 9/00 (2006.01); B65H 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/10 (2013.01); B65H 5/085 (2013.01); B65H 9/10 (2013.01); B65H 2511/232 (2013.01); B65H 2553/41 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2511/232 + B65H 2220/01

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044908 A1 20001018; EP 1044908 B1 20030528; AT 241556 T 20030615; AU 2265600 A 20001012; AU 770094 B2 20040212; BR 0001565 A 20001031; BR 0001565 B1 20090505; CA 2304419 A1 20001009; CA 2304419 C 20040525; CH 693378 A5 20030715; CN 1114553 C 20030716; CN 1270134 A 20001018; DE 60002942 D1 20030703; DE 60002942 T2 20040311; DK 1044908 T3 20030922; ES 2200742 T3 20040316; JP 2000327179 A 20001128; TW 562744 B 20031121; US 6378862 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090303

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090401

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-02 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090306

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090311

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-24 [PRVN] PETITION FOR REVIEW BY THE ENLARGED BOARD OF APPEAL NOT GRANTED

- Free text: PETITION FOR REVIEW OBVIOUSLY UNSUBSTANTIATED

- Effective date: 20090403

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090303

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-13 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-05-13 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090313

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090313

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-11-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

2008-08-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20040225

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

2004-04-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200742 T3

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-09-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-09-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60002942 P 20030703

2003-06-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-05-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-05-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030528

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000311

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI