Global patent index - EP 1044911 A2

EP 1044911 A2 2000-10-18 - Method and device for lateral alignment

Title (en)

Method and device for lateral alignment

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum seitlichen Ausrichten

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif d'alignement latéral

Publication

EP 1044911 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104610 A

Priority

DE 19916550 A

Abstract (en)

The sheet alignment method uses 3 successive movement steps for alignment of the sheet front edge, for transverse movement o the sheet (13.1) in the direction of a side stop (9) and for subsequent alignment of the sheet front edge, respectively, before repetition of the sidewards movement of the sheet, e.g. via a suction plate (8). An Independent claim for a sidewards sheet alignment device is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum seitlichen Ausrichten von auf einen Anlegtisch überlappt in einer Förderrichtung zugeführten Bogen, wobei die zugeführten Bogen in einem ersten Teiltakt durch in die Bahn der Bogen schwenkbare Vordermarken nach der Vorderkante, in einem zweiten Teiltakt mittels einer eine senkrecht zur Förderrichtung zu einem Seitenanschlag gerichtete Bewegung ausübenden Saugplatte nach der Seitenkante ausgerichtet sowie in einem dritten Teiltakt durch zusätzliche an den Bogen angreifende, die Bogen gegen die Vordermarken führende Mittel bezüglich der Vorderkante nachausgerichtet werden. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, mit einfachen Mitteln ein gattungsgemäßes Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum paßgerechten Ausrichten von Bogen auf einem Anlegtisch zu schaffen. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, dass der auszurichtende Bogen in einem vierten Teiltakt nochmals von der Saugplatte erfaßt und zum Nachausrichten gegen den Seitenanschlag geführt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/103 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044911 A2 20001018; EP 1044911 A3 20011212; EP 1044911 B1 20031210; DE 19916550 A1 20001019

INPADOC legal status

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110303

2012-02-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50004686

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100320

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50004686

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-12-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI