Global Patent Index - EP 1044912 A1

EP 1044912 A1 2000-10-18 - Haulage car

Title (en)

Haulage car

Title (de)

Transportwagen

Title (fr)

Chariot transporteur

Publication

EP 1044912 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112005 A

Priority

  • DE 19637771 A
  • EP 97944699 A

Abstract (en)

The truck (27) delivering the rolls (24) to the mechanism (2) has rollers by which it travels on guides (17). It has one or more mountings (29) for further trucks (16) on rollers and which travel in the transverse direction. Two guid can be spaced apart for a distance such as to accommodate both a maximum-diameter roll and one which has been used up. The truck mounting can be arranged to slew in the transport plane.

Abstract (de)

Ein Transportwagen zum Transport von Rollen zu einem Rollenwechsler weist eine senkrecht zu seiner Transportrichtung verlaufende Führung zur Aufnahme eines zweiten Transportwagens auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/12; B65G 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 1/00 (2006.01); B65G 1/04 (2006.01); B65H 19/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/126 (2013.01); B65H 2301/415063 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41702 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4172 (2013.01); B65H 2405/422 (2013.01); B65H 2405/4221 (2013.01); B65H 2405/4223 (2013.01); Y10S 414/124 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19637771 A1 19980319; DE 19637771 C2 20020124; BR 9712828 A 19991116; CN 1075785 C 20011205; CN 1230157 A 19990929; DE 59705580 D1 20020110; DE 59706147 D1 20020228; EP 0925247 A1 19990630; EP 0925247 B1 20011128; EP 0925247 B2 20090916; EP 1044912 A1 20001018; EP 1044912 B1 20020109; HK 1022887 A1 20020419; JP 2000503957 A 20000404; JP 3236303 B2 20011210; RU 2162433 C2 20010127; US 6039284 A 20000321; WO 9812132 A1 19980326

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090912

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090911

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090911

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090911

2010-05-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090911

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59706147 20020228

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020110

2002-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 925247

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-10-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 925247

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI