Global patent index - EP 1044915 A2

EP 1044915 A2 2000-10-18 - Web cutting apparatus and method

Title (en)

Web cutting apparatus and method

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Schneiden einer Bahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour couper une bande

Publication

EP 1044915 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00302774 A

Priority

  • GB 9908825 A
  • GB 9917572 A

Abstract (en)

A web cutting apparatus comprises an upstream web drive (18) for continuously feeding a web (16) to be cut into a web buffer (24). A downstream web drive (38) intermittently feeds the web (16) from the web buffer (24) to a cutting station (44). Measuring devices (36, 38) measure the length of the web (16) fed into and from the web buffer (24), and the length (Lb) of web in the buffer is calculated therefrom. A control device (28) responsive to information received from this calculation controls operation of the downstream web drive (38) and of the cutting station (44). Accurate cutting of the web is thereby possible irrespective of any variations in the speed of the web arriving at the cutting apparatus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/00; B65H 20/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/70 (2006.01); B26D 1/18 (2006.01); B26D 5/26 (2006.01); B26D 5/30 (2006.01); B65H 20/34 (2006.01); B65H 23/04 (2006.01); B65H 26/06 (2006.01); B65H 35/04 (2006.01); B65H 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/042 (2013.01); B65H 20/34 (2013.01); B65H 35/04 (2013.01); B65H 2511/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044915 A2 20001018; EP 1044915 A3 20020605; EP 1044915 B1 20040428; DE 60010171 D1 20040603; DE 60010171 T2 20050421; JP 2000327197 A 20001128

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60010171

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021123

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: XEIKON INTERNATIONAL N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI