Global patent index - EP 1044919 A1

EP 1044919 A1 2000-10-18 - Elevator door

Title (en)

Elevator door

Title (de)

Aufzugstür

Title (fr)

Porte d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 1044919 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107842 A

Priority

DE 29906535 U

Abstract (en)

The door leaf (13, 14) consists of a transparent panel. The panel and-or the vertical frame member (10, 11) has a contact detector, which reacts to contact and is connected with an electronic evaluation unit, which in the event of contact, prevents a open movement of the door panel. The contact detector consists of an aerial sensor foil secured by adhesive on the panel or the vertical frame member.

Abstract (de)

Eine Aufzugstür, die mindestens ein Türblatt (13,14) aus Glas aufweist, regt insbesondere Kinder dazu an, sich mit den Händen an der Aufzugstür abzustützen und durch die Aufzugstür in den Aufzugsschacht zu blicken. Beim plötzlichen Öffnen der Aufzugstür kommt es dann zu Handverletzungen zwischen Zarge und Türblatt. Erfindungsgemäß ist eine durchsichtige Aufzugstür mit einem Berührungsdetektor 18 versehen, der vorzugsweise flächenhaft ausgebildet ist. Zusätzlich kann an der angrenzenden Zarge 10,11 ein Berührungsdetektor 19 vorgesehen sein. Berührunsdetektoren bewirken im Falle des Ansprechens ein Stillsetzen des Türantriebs, so daß Verletzungen vermieden werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/46 (2013.01); E05F 15/44 (2013.01); E05F 15/47 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29906535 U1 19990902; EP 1044919 A1 20001018

INPADOC legal status

2008-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20071103

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030310

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE NL

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI