Global Patent Index - EP 1044920 A2

EP 1044920 A2 2000-10-18 - Fireproof elevator shaft doors

Title (en)

Fireproof elevator shaft doors

Title (de)

Feuerfeste Aufzug-Schachttüre

Title (fr)

Portes palières pare-feu pour ascenseur

Publication

EP 1044920 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107345 A

Priority

  • EP 00107345 A
  • EP 99810299 A

Abstract (en)

The fire-proof door (1) comprises a door-frame consisting of a door-transom (6), two door-posts(5) and a threshold (4). Two horizontally movable door leaves (10,11) on the frame are guided at their top and bottom ends by slide or roller guides (13) alo horizontal guide rails (8) on the transom and threshold (23). The door-leaves have heat-insulating layers (31) contained in insulated housings (30) which are flange-mounted on the door leaves and are flat.

Abstract (de)

In einem modularen Schachttürsystem entsteht eine feuerfeste Aufzugschachttüre (1) überwiegend durch Anflanschen von mit hocheffizienten, neuartigen Dämmstoffschichten (31) gefüllten, flachen Dämmstoffgehäusen (30) an Standard-Schachttürflügel. Diese Dämmstoffgehäuse sind so ausgebildet, dass sie im Bereich der Schliesskante Durchströmschikanen aufweisen und in geschlossenem Zustand, in Zusammenwirkung mit dem Türrahmen, zusätzliche labyrinthartige Hindernisse (36) gegen Flammen- und Gasdurchtritt bilden. Eine insgesamt flache Bauweise der Schachttüre (1) ermöglicht mit minimalem Verlust an nutzbarer Schachtquerschnittsfläche, die Türen durch einfaches Anflanschen an die Schachtwand (3) rationell zu montieren. Ein breiter Türrahmen vermag grosse Bautoleranzen auszugleichen, und geeignete Befestigungselemente erlauben das Ausrichten der Schachttüre in allen Richtungen und in einem, den grossen Bautoleranzen entsprechenden Bereich. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 13/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/303 (2013.01); B66B 13/306 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044920 A2 20001018; EP 1044920 A3 20010110

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032578

2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021101

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI