Global patent index - EP 1044920 A3

EP 1044920 A3 2001-01-10 - Fireproof elevator shaft doors

Title (en)

Fireproof elevator shaft doors

Title (de)

Feuerfeste Aufzug-Schachttüre

Title (fr)

Portes palières pare-feu pour ascenseur

Publication

EP 1044920 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00107345 A

Priority

  • EP 00107345 A
  • EP 99810299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1044920A2] The fire-proof door (1) comprises a door-frame consisting of a door-transom (6), two door-posts(5) and a threshold (4). Two horizontally movable door leaves (10,11) on the frame are guided at their top and bottom ends by slide or roller guides (13) alo horizontal guide rails (8) on the transom and threshold (23). The door-leaves have heat-insulating layers (31) contained in insulated housings (30) which are flange-mounted on the door leaves and are flat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 13/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/303 (2013.01); B66B 13/306 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044920 A2 20001018; EP 1044920 A3 20010110

INPADOC legal status

2007-11-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1032578

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021101

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI