Global patent index - EP 1045039 A1

EP 1045039 A1 2000-10-18 - Method for the preparation of leather from fish skin

Title (en)

Method for the preparation of leather from fish skin

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Lederherstellung aus Fischhaut

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation de cuir à partir de peau de poisson

Publication

EP 1045039 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107569 A

Priority

EP 99107569 A

Abstract (en)

A process for the production of leather from fish skin uses undecomposed skin and involves (a) washing/degreasing with alcoh (b) descaling with enzymes, (c) alkaline digestion at not above 18 degrees C followed by decalcification and (d) tanning with sa solution plus organic acids and tanning agents, drying and lubricating with cationic agents.

Abstract (de)

Durch das beschriebene Verfahren für die Lederherstellung aus der Fischhaut kann ein Fischleder erzeugt werden, bei dem die natürlichen Pigmente (Färbung) weitgehend erhalten werden und der fischtypische Geruch beseitigt wird. Dies wird erreicht entweder durch Verarbeitung der frischen Fischhäute oder durch die Frischhaltung und Konservierung der Fischhaut durch Schockfrosten, deren Entfleischung, Entfettung, Kombination der enzymatischen und bei Bedarf mechanischen Entschuppung, Aufschluß der Fischhaut mit alkalischen Substanzen, Entkälkung, Pickelung, Gerbung mit verschiedenen Gerbstoffen, Fettung mit einer Mischung der kationischen und anionischen Fettungsmitteln und entsprechender Zurichtung. So erzeugtes Leder stellt ein Unikat dar, weil es die natürlichen Strukturen und Pigmente aufweist und sich die Schuppentaschen bei der Lederverarbeitung nicht lösen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14C 1/00; C14C 11/00; C14C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14C 1/00 (2006.01); C14C 11/00 (2006.01); C14C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14C 1/00 (2013.01); C14C 11/00 (2013.01); C14C 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045039 A1 20001018; EP 1045039 B1 20040218; AT 259885 T 20040315; DE 59908583 D1 20040325; ES 2217642 T3 20041101

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070415

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070416

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070416

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070415

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040718

2006-07-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060724

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060721

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2217642

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908583

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT NL PT

2004-02-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR IT NL PT

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT NL PT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI