Global patent index - EP 1045043 A1

EP 1045043 A1 2000-10-18 - Method of manufacturing shaped articles of a 2024 type aluminium alloy

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing shaped articles of a 2024 type aluminium alloy

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Formteilen aus Aluminiumlegierung vom Typ 2024

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de pièces de forme en alliage d' aluminium type 2024

Publication

EP 1045043 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420071 A

Priority

FR 9904685 A

Abstract (en)

Highly deformed AlCuMg alloy sheet part production, by subjecting hot rolled sheets to forming before and/or after solution annealing and quenching, is new. Highly deformed AlCuMg alloy parts are produced by: (a) casting a slab containing (by wt.) 3.8-4.5% Cu, 1.2-1.5% Mg, 0.3-0.5% Mn, less than 0.25% Si, less than 0.20% Fe, less 0.20% Zn, less than 0.10% Cr, less than 0.10% Zr and less than 0.10% Ti; (b) optionally homogenizing at 460-510 (preferably 470-500) degrees C for 2-12 (preferably 3-6) hr.; (c) hot rolling with a start temperature of 430-470 (preferably 440-460) degrees C; (d) optionally cold rolling the strip; (e) optionally annealing at 350-450 degrees C; (f) cutting into sheets; and (g) forming by e.g. stretch forming, deep drawing, spinning and/or bending before and/or after solution annealing at 480-50 degrees C for 5 min. to 1 hr. and quenching.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé de fabrication de pièces fortement déformées en alliage AlCuMg comportant les étapes suivantes: a) coulée d'une plaque de composition (% en poids): Cu: 3,8 - 4,5Mg: 1,2 - 1,5 Mn: 0,3 - 0,5Si < 0,25Fe < 0,20Zn < 0,20Cr < 0,10 Zr < 0,10Ti < 0,10 , b) éventuellement homogénéisation à une température comprise entre 460 et 510°C entre 2 et 12 h, et préférentiellement à une température comprise entre 470 et 500 °C pour une durée entre 3 et 6 h, c) laminage à chaud avec une température d'entrée comprise entre 430 et 470°C, et de préférence comprise entre 440 et 460°C, d) découpe des tôles, e) mise en forme par un ou plusieurs procédés tels que le roulage, l'étirage-formage, l'emboutissage, le fluotournage ou le pliage, f) mise en solution entre 480 et 500°C, d'une durée comprise entre 5 mn et 1 h, g) trempe, la mise en forme pouvant intervenir avant ou après la mise en solution et la trempe. L'invention s'applique notamment à la fabrication de panneaux de fuselage d'avions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/16; C22F 1/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 3/00 (2006.01); C22C 21/12 (2006.01); C22C 21/16 (2006.01); C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/057 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/057 (2013.01); C22C 21/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045043 A1 20001018; EP 1045043 B1 20050518; BR 0001563 A 20001031; DE 00420071 T1 20040422; DE 60020188 D1 20050623; DE 60020188 T2 20060112; FR 2792001 A1 20001013; FR 2792001 B1 20010518; GB 0008506 D0 20000524; GB 2352453 A 20010131; JP 2000328211 A 20001128; US 2003140990 A1 20030731

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM ISSOIRE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60020188

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-05-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60020188

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20150915

2015-10-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM ISSOIRE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20150915

2015-04-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM FRANCE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60020188

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM ISSOIRE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60020188

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60020188

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60020188

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60020188

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-06-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60020188

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM FRANCE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20111123

2011-03-16 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20101014

2007-10-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALCAN RHENALU

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-03-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

- Effective date: 20060217

2007-03-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: AIRBUS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20060220

2006-06-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2006-04-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

- Effective date: 20060217

2006-04-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: AIRBUS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20060220

2006-04-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

- Effective date: 20060217

2005-09-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60020188

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-05-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-22 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2004-01-28 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031031

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010120

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI