Global Patent Index - EP 1045047 A1

EP 1045047 A1 2000-10-18 - A device for expelling the vegetable impurities in a wool card

Title (en)

A device for expelling the vegetable impurities in a wool card

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Ausscheiden von pflanzlichen Verunreinigungen in einer Krempel

Title (fr)

Appareil d'expulsion d'impuretés vegetales dans une carde dite laine

Publication

EP 1045047 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00107736 A

Priority

IT TO990299 A

Abstract (en)

A device for expelling the vegetable impurities in a wool card comprises at least one Morel cylinder (1) with which at least one pair of burr-beaters (2, 3) cooperates. Interposed between the two burr-beaters (2, 3) is a pair of rolls (4, 5) of which the first is a working roll (4) rotating at a speed slower than that of the Morel cylinder (1) and the second is a brush-like roll (5) rotating at a speed faster than that of the working roll (4) but slower than the that of Morel cylinder (1). The brush-like roll (5) discharges the fibres onto the Morel cylinder (1) in a manner such that they are turned over and arranged parallel with one another. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/98

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/98 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/98 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045047 A1 20001018; EP 1045047 B1 20030514; DE 60002629 D1 20030618; DE 60002629 T2 20040311; ES 2195813 T3 20031216; IT 1308803 B1 20020111; IT TO990299 A1 20001016

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FINCARDE S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050412

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050411

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FINCARDE S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-04-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050411

2005-04-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050411

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-05-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040506

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-03-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040316

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-03-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040305

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2195813 T3

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60002629 P 20030618

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FINCARDE S.P.A.

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI