Global patent index - EP 1045050 A1

EP 1045050 A1 2000-10-18 - Method and apparatus for clamping an underwound yarn wrap on a spinning spindle

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for clamping an underwound yarn wrap on a spinning spindle

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Klemmen von Unterwindefäden an einer Spinnspindel

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil pour pincer un fil de sous-renvidage sur une broche d'un métier à filer

Publication

EP 1045050 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101547 A

Priority

DE 19904793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19904793C1] A ring spindle (4) has a yarn clamping sleeve (19) that can be actuated to move axially towards a clamping ring (16) so that conical surfaces (21,22) grip the yarn to produce underwinding turns during bobbin changing. The clamping ring (16) and/or sleeve (19) have a surface structure (26), e.g. undulations, serrations, resilient coating to improve grip. The clamping ring and sleeve can be mounted so as to prevent relative rotation, with the structural elements (26) intermeshing with each other.

Abstract (de)

Um an einer Klemmvorrichtung 12 zum Klemmen des Unterwindefadens an einer Ring-spinnspindel 1 das funktionsgerechte Klemmen des Unterwindefadens 6 sicherzustellen, sind die zusammenwirkenden kegelstumpfförmigen Klemmflächen 21, 22 mit einer Stukturierung 26 versehen. Diese Strukturierung kann wellenförmig oder zahnförmig sein oder auch nur in einer Aufrauhung dieser Klemmflächen bestehen. Um den Eingriff an beiden Klemmelementen 16, 19 angeordneter, ineinandergreifender Strukturierungen 26 aufrecht zu erhalten, können die Klemmelemente mit ihre winkelgerechte Zuordnung aufrecht erhaltenden Einrichtungen (14) versehen sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/04 (2006.01); D01H 1/38 (2006.01); D01H 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19904793 C1 20000803; EP 1045050 A1 20001018; EP 1045050 B1 20030813; JP 2000226741 A 20000815; US 6289662 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050127

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-03-31 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-03-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040304

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040129

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003239

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020910

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001107

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI