Global Patent Index - EP 1045052 A3

EP 1045052 A3 2000-12-06 - Yarn guiding tube

Title (en)

Yarn guiding tube

Title (de)

Fadenführungsrohr

Title (fr)

Tube de guidage de fil

Publication

EP 1045052 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00104851 A

Priority

DE 19915924 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1045052A2] The yarn take-off tube (1) from a spinning station, such as an open-end spinner, has a dividing joint (4) so that the tube c be broken down into at least two parts. The dividing joint (4) at the yarn guide tube (1) is at a second section (12), away from the spinning station, or at the fi section (11) towards the spinning station. The dividing joint (4) is between the tube sections (11,12). The first (11) and/or se (12) tube sections are closed tubes, with their center axes at an angle to each other. At least one tube section has a coupling to lock the other section to it, as a bayonet or clip coupling, so that the tube sections (11,12) are held together in a release mounting. Or the sections (11,12) can be locked together by screw threads (31,32). One tube section holds the end of the other t section within it. One tube section carries a sensor, between the dividing joint (4) and the end (121) of the yarn guide tube (1 to monitor the yarn guide channel (10) through the guide tube (1) and register the presence of a yarn in the channel (10), and i characteristics such as the thickness and/or yarn mass, and detect any foreign fibers. The dividing joint (4) is across the axis the yarn guide tube (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/40; D01H 13/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19915924 A1 20001012; DE 19915924 B4 20091210; EP 1045052 A2 20001018; EP 1045052 A3 20001206; EP 1045052 B1 20040526; US 6324826 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070307

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040526

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040526

2008-12-03 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RIETER INGOLSTADT GMBH

2007-03-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-06-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-05-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006553 P 20040701

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011119

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010302

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 01H 4/40 A, 7D 01H 13/26 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI