Global Patent Index - EP 1045055 A2

EP 1045055 A2 2000-10-18 - Process for producing loop pile fabrics on double carpet looms

Title (en)

Process for producing loop pile fabrics on double carpet looms

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Schlingenpolware auf Doppelteppichwebmaschinen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de tissus à poil de boucles sur les métiers à tisser les tapis doubles

Publication

EP 1045055 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108131 A

Priority

DE 19917278 A

Abstract (en)

To produce looped pile materials, at a double carpet loom, a thicker weft yarn (11,21) is inserted to spread and support the pile loops (132,232) in each of two successive revolutions (I,II) and a thinner weft yarn (12,22) bonds the pile loops (132,232), on weft plane. The position of the thicker (21,11) and thinner (22,12) weft yarns alternates on each revolution (I,II). The pattern pile yarns (132,232) grip evenly alone round the thicker wefts (11,21). The non-pattern pile yarns (131,231) are tensed and loca evenly between the thicker (11,21) and thinner (12,22) wefts in both revolutions (I,II). The thicker (11,21) and thinner (12,22) wefts are placed exclusively on the planes of both fabric levels (1,2). Pairs of bonding warps (141,142;241,242) grip the thinner wefts (12,22) alternately on both sides exclusively. Following two revolutions (I,II) w the thicker wefts (11,21) are also bonded in, a third revolution is effected where a single thin weft is inserted into each fabr level (1,2) on the pile loop side, to be gripped externally by warps. At each ground fabric, the harness has a filling warp (15, bonded in parallel to the non-pattern pile yarns (131,231). At each of the simultaneously woven fabric layers (1,2), the thicker wefts (11,21) are inserted over the fabric and pref. over the filling warps (15,25). Or the thicker wefts are inserted alternate on both sides of the woven fabric layers. When using a loom which can insert three wefts simultaneously, a thicker weft (11,21) inserted in one of the fabric layers (1,2) and two thinner wefts (12,22) are inserted on both sides of the non-pattern pile yarn (131,231) in the other fabric layer (2,1). Or a thicker weft (11,21) and a thinner weft are inserted into two sheds of one fabri layer (1,2), and a third thinner weft is inserted as a backing weft in the other fabric layer (2,1).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von Schlingenpolware auf Doppelteppichwebmaschinen, wobei in jeder Tour (I, II) je ein Schussfaden (11,12; 21, 22) in jeder Schusseintragsebene eingetragen wird und wobei der oberen und der unteren Schusseintragsebene je eine Gruppe von Kettfäden für eine erste bzw. zweite Schlingenpolware (1, 2) zugeordnet ist. Mit dem Ziel die Produktivität der Herstellung zu erhöhen und die Trittelastizität zu verbessern, wird das Verfahren dadurch verbessert, dass in jeweils zwei aufeinander folgenden Touren (I, II) je ein dicker Schussfaden (11, 21) für das Aufspreizen und Stützen der Polschlingen (132, 232) und ein dünner Schussfaden (12, 22) für das Fixieren der Polschlinge (132, 232) an der Grundware in je einer Schusseintragsebene eingetragen wird, dass die Zuordnung der dicken (21, 11) und dünnen Schussfäden (22, 12) nach jeder dieser Touren (I, II) wechselt, dass der musternde Polfaden (132, 232) den dicken Schussfaden (11, 21) regelmäßig allein umgreift, und dass die nicht musternden Polfäden (131, 231) und ggfs. die Füllkette (15, 25) in diesen beiden Touren (I, II) regelmäßig zwischen dem dicken (11, 21) und dem dünnen Schussfaden (12, 22) gestreckt positioniert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 27/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045055 A2 20001018; EP 1045055 A3 20010905; EP 1045055 B1 20041229; DE 19917278 C1 20010118

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-02-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE FR

2004-12-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE FR

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020218

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE FR

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI