Global Patent Index - EP 1045060 A3

EP 1045060 A3 2001-04-11 - Sizing apparatus

Title (en)

Sizing apparatus

Title (de)

Schlichtevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'encollage

Publication

EP 1045060 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00102572 A

Priority

JP 10532299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1045060A2] A a sizing apparatus (10) includes a tank (14) containing a sizing liquid (12), a dip roller (20) for dipping a warp sheet (26) in the sizing liquid, and a squeeze roller (24) pressing the warp sheet against the dip roller (20). Generation of the under-sizing and the stop mark is controlled by having the squeeze roller (24) press the warp sheet with respect to the running direction of the warp sheet substantially in the horizontal direction against the downstream side of the dip roller (20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/04 (2006.01); D06B 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045060 A2 20001018; EP 1045060 A3 20010411; EP 1045060 B1 20040428; DE 60010173 D1 20040603; DE 60010173 T2 20040826; JP 2000303343 A 20001031; JP 3517152 B2 20040405

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160202

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TSUDAKOMA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60010173

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI