Global Patent Index - EP 1045061 A2

EP 1045061 A2 2000-10-18 - Method for verifying the laundry load conditions in a laundry washing and/or drying machine, and machine which implements such method

Title (en)

Method for verifying the laundry load conditions in a laundry washing and/or drying machine, and machine which implements such method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Prüfen des Wäschegewichts in einer Wasch- und/oder -Trocknermaschine und Maschine, die ein solches Verfahren verwendet

Title (fr)

Procédé pour vérifier la charge du linge dans une machine à laver et/ou à sécher et machine utilisant un tel procédé

Publication

EP 1045061 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99124780 A

Priority

  • EP 95109302 A
  • IT TO940496 A

Abstract (en)

It is described a method for verifying the laundry load conditions in a washing and/or drying machine, comprising a drum containing the laundry, rotated by a motor (M), wherein a high spin speed (MC) is gradually reached during an operating phase; the main characteristics of said method consists in the fact that before reaching said high spin speed (MC) the load entity is verified and if the load exceeds a predetermined mass, also the load balancing conditions are verified, and that, in order to avoid any risks for the mechanical structure of the machine, the maximum spin speed (1400 rpm) is inhibited if a load higher than said predetermined mass and an out-of-balance condition of said load are detected. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 37/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/203 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0687760 A2 19951220; EP 0687760 A3 19960821; EP 0687760 B1 20000920; DE 69518876 D1 20001026; DE 69518876 T2 20010201; DE 69533595 D1 20041104; DE 69533595 T2 20051006; EP 1045061 A2 20001018; EP 1045061 A3 20020515; EP 1045061 B1 20040929; ES 2151568 T3 20010101; ES 2229615 T3 20050416; IT 1266861 B1 19970121; IT TO940496 A1 19951218; IT TO940496 D0 19940616

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69533595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130228

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110704

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110711

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090617

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-09-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2229615

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: INDESIT COMPANY S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-12-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69533595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0687760

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-02-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR

2000-10-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 687760

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR