Global Patent Index - EP 1045069 A2

EP 1045069 A2 2000-10-18 - Ballastless track superstructure with prefabricated concrete slabs and process for their replacement

Title (en)

Ballastless track superstructure with prefabricated concrete slabs and process for their replacement

Title (de)

Schotterloser Oberbau mit vorgefertigten Betontragplatten sowie Verfahren zum Ersatz derselben

Title (fr)

Superstructure de voie sans ballast à dalles de béton préfabriquées et procédé pour leur remplacement

Publication

EP 1045069 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890109 A

Priority

AT 65299 A

Abstract (en)

The ballastless superstructure is for a railway track and employs prefabricated concrete plates (1a), which in thee superstructure longitudinal direction have a greater extent than that crossways. The plates have at least two, particularly symmetrically arranged recesses extending from top to bottom, which are particularly rectangular and are downwardly open. Differ length sides are provided, the longer sides extending in the longitudinal direction of the superstructure. At least two adjacent concrete support plates (1a) at least on their face sides beneath the rail foot have different thicknesses and the mortar (6,6a) beneath the support plate with the lesser thickness is at least formed in two layers. The upper layer exte to the area of the seam and a lower layer directly next to the ground extends beneath the support plates of different thicknesse

Abstract (de)

Schotterloser Oberbau mit vorgefertigten, schienentragenden Betontragplatten (1, 1a), die in Oberbaulängsrichtung eine größere Erstreckung als quer hierzu aufweisen, mit zwei von oben nach unten sich erstreckenen Ausnehmungen (2, 2a), die nach unten offen ausgebildet sind, wobei sich ein Untergrundmörtel (6, 6a), der auf einem Untergrund (7), z. B. Beton, egalisierten Fels, aufruht, in zumindest zwei Ausnehmungen (2, 2a) erstreckt und zwischen der vorgefertigten Betontragplatte (1, 1a) und dem Untergrundmörtel eine, insbesondere vorgefertigte, Schichte, vorzugsweise mit einem Granulat aus gummielastischem Material, an der Unterseite dieser angeordnet ist, wobei die Betontragplatten mit ihren Stirnseiten in Abstand zueinander angeordnet sind, wodurch eine Fuge (20) gebildet ist und zumindest zwei einander benachbarte Betontragplatten zueinander unterschiedliche Dicke aufweisen, und der Untergrundmörtel (6, 6a) unterhalb der Tragplatte mit der geringeren Dicke zumindest zweischichtig aufgebaut ist, und sich die obere Schichte (6a) des Untergrundmörtels bis zum Bereich der Fuge (20) erstreckt und eine untere Schichte (6) des Untergrundmörtels, die, insbesondere unmittelbar, dem Untergrund benachbart ist, sich unterhalb der Tragplatten (1, 1a) unterschiedlicher Dicke erstreckt. Zur Veröffentlichung gemeinsam mit der Zusammenfassung ist Fig. 4 bestimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/004 (2013.01); E01B 1/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045069 A2 20001018; EP 1045069 A3 20010801; AT 409641 B 20020925; AT A65299 A 20020215; HR P20000210 A2 20010430; HR P20000210 B1 20090831; HU 0001370 A2 20010129; HU 0001370 A3 20010228; HU 0001370 D0 20000628; HU 221891 B1 20030228; PL 200575 B1 20090130; PL 339610 A1 20001023; SK 5252000 A3 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050204

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GR IT LI

2002-04-24 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010927

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GR IT LI

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI