Global Patent Index - EP 1045071 A2

EP 1045071 A2 2000-10-18 - Geocomposite system for roads and bridges and construction method

Title (en)

Geocomposite system for roads and bridges and construction method

Title (de)

Geo-Verbundmembran für Strassee und Brücken und Verfahren zu deren Konstruktion

Title (fr)

Membrane géocomposite pour des routes et des ponts et procédé de construction associé

Publication

EP 1045071 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00107523 A

Priority

US 28985899 A

Abstract (en)

A geocomposite system (10,40) for increasing the service life of roads, bridges, or the like, includes a geocomposite layer (12,42) having a geomembrane (18,60) disposed between two geotextile backings (20,22,56,58), a structural layer (14,44) for supporting the geocomposite layer (12,42), and a base layer (16,46) formed on top of the geocomposite layer (12,42). The geomembrane (18,60) is impermeable and the geotextile backings (20,22,56,58) are sufficiently porous to provide a wicking action of moisture or liquid laterally along the geomembrane (18,60) and out of the geocomposite system (10,40) to prevent moisture or liquid damage. The geomembrane (18,60) prevents the intrusion of liquids including deicing salts into the structural layers of roads, bridges, or the like abating deterioration in the structural layers such as corrosion of reinforcing steel. The geocomposite layer (12,42) is bonded to and conforms to the structural layer (14,44), thus reducing reflective, shrinkage and fatigue cracking and increasing the structural capacity of the road or bridge. Preferably, the geomembrane (18,60) is an extruded polyvinylchloride web and the geotextile backings (20,22,56,58) are fabricated of a mat of non-woven polyester fibers. The geotextile backings (20,22,56,58) are heat coupled to the geomembrane (18,60), preferably using a calendaring process. The geocomposite layer (12,42) is also bonded to the base layer (16,46). In the related method, the geocomposite system is constructed by fabricating the geocomposite layer, applying a tack coat to the structural layer, placing the geocomposite layer with the geotextile backing down on the prepared structural layer, rolling the geocomposite to provide conformity with the structural layer, applying a tack coat to the other geotextile backing and forming and bonding the base layer on the geocomposite layer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 3/06 (2006.01); E01C 11/22 (2006.01); E01D 19/08 (2006.01); E01F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 3/06 (2013.01); E01C 11/228 (2013.01); E01D 19/083 (2013.01); E01F 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4362780 A 19821207 - MARZOCCHI ALFRED, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045071 A2 20001018; EP 1045071 A3 20010627; CA 2302117 A1 20001012; US 2001002497 A1 20010607

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011228

2002-04-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 01C 11/16 A, 7E 01F 5/00 B, 7E 01C 3/06 B, 7E 01D 19/08 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI