Global Patent Index - EP 1045073 A1

EP 1045073 A1 2000-10-18 - An excavation tool and a method for forming a column of consolidated soil

Title (en)

An excavation tool and a method for forming a column of consolidated soil

Title (de)

Ausgrabungswerkzeug und Verfahren um eine Säulenstruktur von konsolidierten Boden zu bilden

Title (fr)

Outil d'excavation et procédé de fabrication d'une colonne en sol consolidée

Publication

EP 1045073 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00107737 A

Priority

IT TP990301 A

Abstract (en)

An excavation tool (20) includes a tubular central shaft (21) with a vertical axis (x) and a central axial aperture (21a) for supplying a ground-consolidating fluid to nozzles (32) which are directed generally downwardly and arranged along a lower radial edge (29) of one or more blade elements (22) which project radially from the central shaft (21) and are inclined thereto in a helical configuration. The nozzles (32) direct high pressure jets (33) of consolidating fluid for fluidising and at least partially breaking up the soil before it is engaged by the blade elements (22) in their excavation movement. A method is also described for forming a column of consolidated soil by means of such excavation tool. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/12 (2006.01); E02D 5/36 (2006.01); E02D 5/46 (2006.01); E02D 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/36 (2013.01); E02D 3/126 (2013.01); E02D 5/46 (2013.01); E02D 7/24 (2013.01); E02D 2250/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045073 A1 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-17 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028434

2004-01-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031030

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI