Global patent index - EP 1045093 A2

EP 1045093 A2 2000-10-18 - Lock for a motor vehicle door or the like

Title (en)

Lock for a motor vehicle door or the like

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeug-Türschloss o. dgl.

Title (fr)

Serrure pour une porte d'automobile ou similaire

Publication

EP 1045093 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106212 A

Priority

  • DE 19917264 A
  • DE 19924447 A

Abstract (en)

The door lock has a housing (1) contg. a lock catch (2) and pawl (3), an electrical opening aid (7) for electrical actuation the pawl and a lock mechanism (4) for mechanical operation of the pawl, remotely controlled control electronics (5) and one or m force action chains (6) leading from the outer door handle to the lock mechanism with associated sensors for triggering the switching functions of the control electronics and opening aid. In the normal state only electrical triggering occurs but in a special situation mechanical actuation occurs.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Kraftfahrzeug-Türschloß in Form eines Elektroschlosses mit mechanischer Redundanz. Es handelt sich um ein Kraftfahrzeug-Türschloß mit einem Gehäuse (1) mit darin angeordneter Schloßfalle (2) und Sperrklinke (3), mit einer elektrischen Öffnungshilfe (7) zur elektrischen Betätigung der Sperrklinke (3) und mit einer Schloßmechanik (4) zur mechanischen Betätigung der Sperrklinke (3), mit einer fernsteuerbaren Steuerelektronik (5), bedienbar vorzugsweise durch ein Fernsteuermodul bei einer Bedienungsperson, mit einer von einem Türaußengriff und ggf. auch von anderen Betätigungselementen in die Schloßmechanik (4) verlaufenden Kraftwirkungskette (6) bzw. mehreren entsprechenden Kraftwirkungsketten (6). Das erfindungsgemäße Kraftfahrzeug-Türschloß ist dann dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der Kraftwirkungskette (6) in der Schloßmechanik (4) elektrische Sensoren zugeordnet sind, durch die die Schaltfunktionen der Steuerelektronik (5) und der Öffnungshilfe (7) auslösbar sind, daß im Normalzustand nur eine elektrische Auslösung der Schaltfunktionen und keine mechanische Betätigung erfolgt, daß ein Kuppelschalter (8) vorgesehen ist, durch den in einem Sonderzustand eine mechanische Ankupplung der Kraftwirkungskette (6) an die Schloßmechanik (4) erfolgt, so daß dann eine mechanische Betätigung jedenfalls der Sperrklinke (3) erfolgen kann. In der Schloßmechanik (4) werden normalerweise nur die Sensoren betätigt, obwohl von den Betätigungselementen nur mechanische Betätigungen erfolgen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 77/12 (2013.01); E05B 81/90 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); Y10S 292/65 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045093 A2 20001018; EP 1045093 A3 20010404; EP 1045093 B1 20050601; ES 2241522 T3 20051101; US 6648379 B1 20031118

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50010432

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GOTTSCHALD PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2006-05-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2241522

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-09-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050815

2005-09-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-07-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50010432

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-07-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-06-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040415

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BROSE SCHLIESSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05B 65/20 A, 7E 05B 47/00 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI