Global patent index - EP 1045095 A1

EP 1045095 A1 2000-10-18 - Window fitting and window including such a fitting

Title (en)

Window fitting and window including such a fitting

Title (de)

Fensterbeschlag für ein Fenster und Fenster mit einem solchen Fensterbeschlag

Title (fr)

Ferrure pour fenêtre et fenêtre avec une telle ferrure

Publication

EP 1045095 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101654 A

Priority

DE 19916340 A

Abstract (en)

The window (10) comprises a blind (12) frame on which is mounted a casement (14) frame. The casement frame swiveling between open and shut position has an operating bar (30) cooperating with a bolt (34), and a bolt plate (38) on the blind frame, by whic the closed casement frame is locked on the blind frame. The bolt slides parallel with a side profile of the casement frame. The operating bar slides in a straight line from a locking point to an open point (0). The locking width (r) of the bolt equals half slide path (Y) of the bar,

Abstract (de)

Ein Fenster weist einen Blendrahmen (12) und einen Flügelrahmen (14) auf, der am Blendrahmen (12) gelagert und aus einer geschlossenen Stellung in eine Öffnungsrichtung (X) schwenkbar ist. Der geschlossene Flügelrahmen (14) ist durch einen Riegel (34) verriegelbar, der mittels einer Betätigungsstange (30) parallel zu einem Seitenprofil des Flügelrahmens (14) in Öffnungsrichtung (X) hinter ein Riegelblech (38) am Blendrahmen (12) schiebbar ist. Um eine hohe Sicherheit gegen Einbruch zu bieten ist der Riegel (34) an seinem hintergreifenden Teil mindestens so breit wie ein Drittel des Betätigungswegs (Y) der Betätigungsstange (30) gestaltet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05B 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/185 (2013.01); E05B 17/2088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045095 A1 20001018; DE 19916340 A1 20001019

INPADOC legal status

2010-01-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090806

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031009

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI