Global Patent Index - EP 1045105 A2

EP 1045105 A2 2000-10-18 - Roller shutter

Title (en)

Roller shutter

Title (de)

Rolladen

Title (fr)

Volet à rouleau

Publication

EP 1045105 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810266 A

Priority

DE 29906144 U

Abstract (en)

The blind (10) consists of a number of horizontal slats (12) with profiled edges (14,18) which lock together but allow the s to turn with respect to each other. The outward facing surfaces (50) have decorative patterns, e.g. horizontal grooves (64) of triangular cross-section with an angle between the sides of between 170 degrees and 178 degrees .

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Rolladen od.dgl. beweglicher Verschlussfläche aus mehreren mit ihren Längsseiten aneinandergelenkten Lamellen oder Profilstäben, deren Außenflächen zumindest in Schließstellung des Rolladens eine Sichtfläche bilden, ist die Außenfläche der Lamelle bzw. des Profilstabes durch parallele Linien in mehrere Flächenstreifen oder Längsfelder unterteilt, und wenigstens eines der Längsfelder weist eine querschnittlich gekrümmte Oberflächenkontur auf. Letztere ist konkav gestaltet, und die parallelen Linien sind als Kammlinien ausgebildet; der Querschnittswinkel der erhabenen Kammlinie liegt zwischen 170° und 178°, bevorzugt über 176°. Ist die Oberflächenkontur des Längsfeldes konvex gestaltet, sind die parallelen Linien als tieferliegende Tallinien ausgebildet; der Querschnittswinkel der eingesenkten Tallinie liegt ebenfalls zwischen 170° und 178°, bevorzugt über 176°.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/48 (2006.01); E06B 9/15 (2006.01); E06B 9/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/486 (2013.01); E06B 3/485 (2013.01); E06B 9/15 (2013.01); E06B 2009/1544 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29906144 U1 19991021; AT 342423 T 20061115; DE 50013583 D1 20061123; DK 1045105 T3 20070108; EP 1045105 A2 20001018; EP 1045105 A3 20030507; EP 1045105 B1 20061011; ES 2270801 T3 20070416; PT 1045105 E 20070131

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080329

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080329

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080330

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080329

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080329

2008-11-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-11-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080929

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-10-10 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080929

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT A.G.

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070712

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2270801 T3

2007-03-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070328

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070328

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070324

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-06 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070306

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070305

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20061218

2007-01-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-01-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013583 P 20061123

2006-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061011

2006-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2006-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061011

2006-06-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031107

- Countries: SI

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030829

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 9/15 A

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 3/48 B

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI