Global Patent Index - EP 1045133 A2

EP 1045133 A2 2000-10-18 - Fuel feed apparatus

Title (en)

Fuel feed apparatus

Title (de)

Brennstoffzufuhrgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil d'alimentation en carburant

Publication

EP 1045133 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00108269 A

Priority

  • JP 10952999 A
  • JP 10953099 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel feed apparatus comprises a reservoir 4b containing a fuel pump 5 therein and provided with a fuel in-take port 17. The fuel in-take port 17 is so arranged as to face upward when the body of the motor bicycle or the motor car for which the apparatus is used is made to rest on its side prop stand or prance on the rear wheel. The inside of the fuel in-take port 17 is made to show a labyrinth structure. This the above arrangement, fuel is prevented from flowing out of the sub-tank 16 through the fuel in-take port 17 if the body is inclined so that the engine can be fed with fuel stably for a long period of time if the body is inclined. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/103 (2013.01); F02M 37/106 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP 10220315 A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045133 A2 20001018; EP 1045133 A3 20010307; EP 1045133 B1 20050831; CN 1195650 C 20050406; CN 1270898 A 20001025; TW 426783 B 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080414

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070619

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2004-09-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040706

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: FR IT

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI