Global Patent Index - EP 1045137 A2

EP 1045137 A2 2000-10-18 - Ignition device for piston combustion engines

Title (en)

Ignition device for piston combustion engines

Title (de)

Zündvorrichtung für Kolben-Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'allumage pour des moteurs à combustion à piston

Publication

EP 1045137 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105457 A

Priority

DE 19916806 A

Abstract (en)

The ignition device has a movable piston electrode (5) incorporated in the base (4) of the reciprocating piston (2), coopera with a counter-electrode (6) incorporated in the cylinder head, positioned so that the spark gap between them is less than the minimum relative spacing between the electrodes, e.g. by positioning the piston electrode to one side of the counter-electrode, that it projects beyond the latter in the upper dead-point position of the piston.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Zündvorrichtung für Kolben-Brennkraftmaschinen mit einer im Kolbenboden angeordneten bewegbaren Kolbenelektrode und einer im Zylinderkopf angeordneten Gegen-Elektrode, und mit einer sich zwischen den beiden Elektroden ausbildenden Funkenstrecke, ist die räumliche Anordnung der beiden Elektroden derart, daß die Funkenstrecke kleiner als der minimale Abstand zwischen der Gegen-Elektrode und dem Kolbenboden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 23/10 (2006.01); F02F 3/26 (2006.01); F02P 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9613660 A1 19960509 - SAAB AUTOMOBILE [SE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045137 A2 20001018; EP 1045137 A3 20020731; EP 1045137 B1 20060222; DE 19916806 A1 20001026; DE 50012242 D1 20060427; ES 2257983 T3 20060816; JP 2000297734 A 20001024; US 6453862 B1 20020924

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070315

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070316

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060306

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070316

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070315

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070315

2007-11-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070316

2007-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061123

2006-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2257983 T3

2006-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-05-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060525

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012242 P 20060427

2006-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060327

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060327

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-03 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060303

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-02-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050331

2003-04-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI