Global Patent Index - EP 1045142 A2

EP 1045142 A2 2000-10-18 - Pump housing

Title (en)

Pump housing

Title (de)

Pumpengehäuse

Title (fr)

Carter de pompe

Publication

EP 1045142 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105659 A

Priority

DE 19916376 A

Abstract (en)

The pump is enclosed in a pressure casing (15) in which are constructed pressure channels (60), with the pressure casing attached to a main casing (14) accommodating the pump unit (6). The pressure casing and pumps units are made of a high strength material, preferably steel, and the main casing is made of lower strength material, preferably aluminium or aluminium alloy. The pressure channel opens out into a housing (18) for the pump unit. An Independent claim is included for a fuel pump in a radial piston design has a pump casing in which up to three pump unit are housed.

Abstract (de)

Offenbart ist ein Pumpengehäuse, bei dem die mit Hochdruck beaufschlagten Druckkanäle in einem oder mehreren gesonderten Gehäuseteilen ausgebildet sind. Die mit dem Saugdruck beaufschlagten Bereiche sind in einem Hauptgehäuse zusammengefaßt. Dieses Konstruktion ermöglicht es, das Hauptgehäuse in Leichtbau zu fertigen, während die mit Hochdruck beaufschlagten Gehäuse aus einem Material hoher Festigkeit oder in einer entsprechenden Bauweise hergestellt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 53/16 (2013.01); F04B 1/0404 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045142 A2 20001018; EP 1045142 A3 20010221; DE 19916376 A1 20001019

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040309

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031028

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 1/04 A, 7F 04B 53/16 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI