Global Patent Index - EP 1045151 A2

EP 1045151 A2 2000-10-18 - Actuator

Title (en)

Actuator

Title (de)

Betätigungsglied

Title (fr)

Vérin

Publication

EP 1045151 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00107180 A

Priority

NO 991783 A

Abstract (en)

Actuator for valves to be readjusted by rotational movement over a given angle, typically being 90 DEG , comprising an essentially cylindric housing (1) for receiving a piston (5) arranged for axial movement in the housing under influence of a pressure fluid, input/output-channels (22,23) in the housing for the pressure fluid, and a screw device (9,26) for transferring the movement of the piston to rotational movement of an output shaft (8) arranged to be connected to a valve. A second piston (6) is arranged in the body (1) axially in line with said (first) piston (5) and arranged for an opposite movement relative to the first piston. Both pistons (5,6) are forcibly (11,12) conducted in the body (1) without rotational movement. An inner rotational unit (7) on the output shaft (8) constitutes a part (26) of the screw device and portions (9) on both of the pistons (5,6) constitutes other co-operating parts of the screw device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/068 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045151 A2 20001018; EP 1045151 A3 20020522; NO 307227 B1 20000228; NO 991783 D0 19990414

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021101

2003-03-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI