Global Patent Index - EP 1045196 A2

EP 1045196 A2 2000-10-18 - Lighting assembly with a supporting structure

Title (en)

Lighting assembly with a supporting structure

Title (de)

Beleuchtungseinrichtung mit einer Tragbasis

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'éclairage avec une structure porteuse

Publication

EP 1045196 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104962 A

Priority

DE 29906884 U

Abstract (en)

The cover (4a) comprises self-supporting sections (4) in adjacent arrangement on the flat area of the radiating side (6). Th are connected by supports (3) between the sections (4) and the base (2).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Beleuchtungseinrichtung mit einer Tragbasis (2), die mittelbar oder unmittelbar an einer Decke oder Wand eines Raumes befestigbar ist, wobei an einer Abstrahlseite (6) der Beleuchtungseinrichtung (1) ein teillichtdurchlässiges Abdeckelement (4a) angeordnet ist, das durch Tragelemente (3) mit der Tragbasis (2) verbunden ist, wobei rückseitig vom Abdeckelement (4a) eine Mehrzahl Lampen (5) angeordnet sind. Zwecks Vereinfachung besteht das Abdeckelement (4a) aus mehreren jeweils selbsttragenden Abdeckelementteilen (4), die im Flächenbereich der Abstrahlseite (6) nebeneinander angeordnet sind und durch den Abdeckelementteilen (4) zugeordneten Tragelementen (3) mit der Tragbasis (2) verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/04; F21V 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 2/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/04 (2006.01); F21V 3/00 (2006.01); F21V 15/01 (2006.01); F21V 17/10 (2006.01); F21V 17/12 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 21/02 (2006.01); F21V 23/04 (2006.01); F21Y 103/00 (2006.01); F21Y 113/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/102 (2013.01); F21S 2/00 (2013.01); F21S 8/04 (2013.01); F21V 3/00 (2013.01); F21V 17/12 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29906884 U1 20000824; EP 1045196 A2 20001018; EP 1045196 A3 20011205

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21S 8/04 A, 7F 21V 3/00 B, 7F 21V 17/00 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI