Global Patent Index - EP 1045196 A3

EP 1045196 A3 2001-12-05 - Lighting assembly with a supporting structure

Title (en)

Lighting assembly with a supporting structure

Title (de)

Beleuchtungseinrichtung mit einer Tragbasis

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'éclairage avec une structure porteuse

Publication

EP 1045196 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00104962 A

Priority

DE 29906884 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1045196A2] The cover (4a) comprises self-supporting sections (4) in adjacent arrangement on the flat area of the radiating side (6). Th are connected by supports (3) between the sections (4) and the base (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/04; F21V 3/00; F21V 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 2/00 (2016.01); F21S 8/04 (2006.01); F21V 3/00 (2015.01); F21V 15/01 (2006.01); F21V 17/10 (2006.01); F21V 17/12 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 21/02 (2006.01); F21V 23/04 (2006.01); F21Y 103/00 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/102 (2013.01); F21S 2/00 (2013.01); F21S 8/04 (2013.01); F21V 3/00 (2013.01); F21V 17/12 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29906884 U1 20000824; EP 1045196 A2 20001018; EP 1045196 A3 20011205

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 8/04 A, 7F 21V 3/00 B, 7F 21V 17/00 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI