Global Patent Index - EP 1045197 A2

EP 1045197 A2 2000-10-18 - Hang type lighting fixture for workstation

Title (en)

Hang type lighting fixture for workstation

Title (de)

Arbeitsplatzbezogene Pendelleuchte

Title (fr)

Lampe suspendue pour poste de travail

Publication

EP 1045197 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104314 A

Priority

DE 19917026 A

Abstract (en)

A pendulum lamp has at least one lamp fitting (6,7) for direct illumination of a work place (2) and a further fitting (5) fo effecting an indirect illumination. The indirect light unit is located with its longitudinal extent in the transverse direction the orientation of the work place. The direct lamp unit is located in the region of one end relative to the longitudinal extent the lamp component. The longitudinal extent of the pendulum lamp (4) is determined by the longitudinal extent of the lamp fitting effecting the indirect illumination. The lamp unit provided for the direct illumination of the work place is located with its longitudinal ext running in the transverse direction to that of the lamp component.

Abstract (de)

Eine arbeitsplatzbezogene Pendelleuchte mit zumindest einem Leuchtenbestandteil 6, 7 zum direkten Beleuchten eines Arbeitsplatzes (2) und mit einem weiteren Leuchtenbestandteil 5, 5' zum Bewirken einer indirekten Beleuchtung, wobei der zum Erzielen einer indirekten Beleuchtung vorgesehene Leuchtenbestandteil 5, 5' mit seiner Längserstreckung in Querrichtung zur Orientierung des Arbeitsplatzes 2 und der zum Bewirken der direkten Beleuchtung vorgesehene Leuchtenbestandteil 6, 7 im Bereich eines Endes bezogen auf die Längserstreckung des Leuchtenbestandteils 5, 5' angeordnet ist, ist dadurch bestimmt, daß die Längserstreckung der Pendelleuchte 4 im wesentlichen durch die Längserstreckung des die indirekte Beleuchtung bewirkenden Leuchtenbestandteils 5, 5' bestimmt ist und der zumindest eine zum direkten Beleuchten des Arbeitsplatzes vorgesehene Leuchtenbestandteil 6, 7 mit seiner Längserstreckung in Querrichtung zur Längserstreckung des Leuchtenbestandteils 5, 5' verlaufend angeordnet ist und daß zum Erzeugen des direkten und indirekten Lichtanteils der Pendelleuchte 4 jeweils eigene Leuchtmittel eingesetzt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/06 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/06 (2013.01); F21V 7/0016 (2013.01); F21W 2131/402 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 20002391 U1 20000511; DE 19917026 A1 20001026; EP 1045197 A2 20001018; EP 1045197 A3 20011128

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-08-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI