Global Patent Index - EP 1045203 A1

EP 1045203 A1 2000-10-18 - Multifuel burner

Title (en)

Multifuel burner

Title (de)

Mehrstoffbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur à plusieurs combustibles

Publication

EP 1045203 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400504 A

Priority

FR 9905003 A

Abstract (en)

Burner has, next to front nose (22), wings (20) to deviate internal flux of poor fuel coming from conduit (15). Wings form, combustion chamber, whirling jets around air jets form conduits (9, 11). Burner also comprises wings (21) for axial guiding of external flux of poor fuel coming from conduit (17). Nose has hoop (23) supporting wings (20) and inclined to rotate flux from conduit (15). An Independent claim is also included for the heating method of rotating furnace.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention a pour objet un brûleur à plusieurs combustibles pour four tubulaire tournant comportant une buse (3a) et des conduits (7, 9, 11) sensiblement concentriques d'alimentation en un premier combustible et d'alimentation axiale et radiale d'air primaire, dans lequel les orifices de sortie (9b, 11b) des conduits (9, 11) d'air sont disposés à l'extérieur de l'ouverture (7b) de sortie d'un conduit (7) de combustible ; lequel brûleur comporte un conduit (5) central d'air primaire muni d'un stabilisateur (5a) de flamme comportant des ouvertures (5b, 5c) de passage d'air ; le brûleur selon l'invention comporte deux conduits annulaires distincts de transport d'un deuxième combustible, dit pauvre, un conduit (15) comportant des moyens (20) de mise en rotation du combustible pauvre, et un conduit (17) entourant le conduit interne (15). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 17/00; F23C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 17/00 (2013.01); F23C 7/004 (2013.01); F23G 2201/303 (2013.01); F23G 2209/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045203 A1 20001018; EP 1045203 B1 20040428; AT 265653 T 20040515; DE 60010174 D1 20040603; DE 60010174 T2 20050113; DK 1045203 T3 20040601; FR 2792393 A1 20001020; FR 2792393 B1 20010629

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-25 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060224

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60010174 P 20040603

2004-06-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE DK

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010130

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI