Global Patent Index - EP 1045211 A3

EP 1045211 A3 2000-12-20 - Linear air-diffuser

Title (en)

Linear air-diffuser

Title (de)

Länglicher Luftverteiler

Title (fr)

Diffuseur d'air linéaire

Publication

EP 1045211 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00201300 A

Priority

IT PN990036 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1045211A2] Air-diffuser ( D ) of linear type constituted by : a shaped piece (1) suitable to form the outer casing of the same diffuser ( D) , an airflow controller ( 2 ) formed by a cylindrical body ( 20 ) which is crossed by a longitudinal slit ( 21 ) and a diaphragmatic element ( 3 ) suitable to removably connect two lengths of the shaped piece ( 1 ) and to support an end of the airflow controller ( 2 ). The sides of the diaphragmatic element ( 3 ) are provided with shaped parts ( 37 - 38) which are complementary to a shaped part ( 13 ) of the shaped piece ( 1 ). Inserting groups of diaphragmatic elements ( 3 ) disposed at the ends of respective airflow controllers ( 2 ) in two equal lengths of the shaped piece ( 1 ) which are arranged in specular and mutually opposite positions allows to obtain portions of diffusion. Said portions of diffusion are mutually interconnectable at their ends by inserting the portions of the shaped piece (1) , which are protruding from the diaphragmatic element ( 3 ) that is disposed at the end of one of said portions of diffusion, in the body of the diaphragmatic element ( 3 ) protruding from the end of another of said portions of diffusion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/065; F24F 13/072

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/065 (2006.01); F24F 13/072 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/072 (2013.01); F24F 13/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045211 A2 20001018; EP 1045211 A3 20001220; IT 1311218 B1 20020304; IT PN990036 A1 20001012; IT PN990036 D0 19990412

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24F 13/065 A, 7F 24F 13/072 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI