Global Patent Index - EP 1045214 A2

EP 1045214 A2 2000-10-18 - Absorption heat pump and method for operating an absorption heat pump

Title (en)

Absorption heat pump and method for operating an absorption heat pump

Title (de)

Absorptionswärmepumpe und Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Absorptionswärmepumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à chaleur à absorption et procédé de fonctionnement d'une pompe à chaleur à absorption

Publication

EP 1045214 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104384 A

Priority

DE 19916907 A

Abstract (en)

A burner (2) vaporises a refrigerant solution into an condenser (13) containing a heat exchanger feeding a radiator (34) and absorber (6) back to the boiler (1) in a closed circuit. Refrigerant then passes through a throttle valve (12) and an evaporator (11) to provide cooling. The system is controlled by a regulator (17) according to data from an outside thermostat (14), a back flow thermostat (15) a forward flow thermostat (16).

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Absorptionswärmepumpe bei dem in einem Kocher (1) eine ein Kältemittel enthaltende Lösung mittels eines Brenners (2) erwärmt wird, um Kältemittel als Kältemitteldampf auszutreiben; der Kältemitteldampf in einem Kondensator (13) gegen ein Heizmittel kondensiert wird; das Kältemittel von dem Kondensator (13) einem Verdampfer (11) sowie einem Absorber (6) zugeführt wird; an Kältemittel verarmte Lösung aus dem Kocher (1) dem Absorber (6) zuführt wird; an Kältemittel reiche Lösung von dem Absorber (6) auf ein Hochdruckniveau gepumpt und erneut dem Kocher (1) zugeführt wird; und das in dem Kondensator (13) erwärmte Heizmittel einem Verbraucher zugeführt wird sowie das von dem Verbraucher abgekühlte Heizmittel zu dem Kondensator (13) zurück geführt wird, ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Außentemperatur und die Temperatur des Heizmittels gemessen werden und die Leistung des Brenners (2) in Abhängigkeit von den gemessenen Temperaturwerten eingestellt wird; und die Menge des dem Verdampfer (11) zugeführten Kältemittels, die Menge der dem Absorber (6) zugeführten, an Kältemittel verarmten Lösung und die Fördermenge der Lösungspumpe (8) geregelt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 49/04; F25B 30/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 49/04 (2006.01); F25B 30/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 49/043 (2013.01); F25B 30/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0202432 A2 19861126 - DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045214 A2 20001018; EP 1045214 A3 20020821; EP 1045214 B1 20060524; AT 327486 T 20060615; DE 19916907 A1 20001026; DE 19916907 C2 20021205; DE 50012799 D1 20060629; US 6332328 B1 20011225

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160317

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070302

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060825

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HELIOTHERM WARMEPUMPENTECHNIK GES.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-06-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070227

2007-04-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: HELIOPLUS ENERGY SYSTEMS GMBH

- Effective date: 20070207

2007-03-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HELIOPLUS ENERGY SYSTEMS GMBH; LANGKAMPFEN (AT)

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HELIOTHERM WAERMEPUMPENTECHNIK GES.M.B.H.; MITTERWEG 15; 6336 LANGKAMPFEN (AT)

2007-03-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-10-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061024

2006-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060918

2006-09-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2006-09-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060904

2006-08-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-08-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012799 P 20060629

2006-06-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-05-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELIOTHERM WAERMEPUMPENTECHNIK GES.M.B.H.

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 25B 49/04 A, 7F 25B 30/04 B, 7F 25B 15/00 B

2002-05-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELIOTHERM SOLARTECHNIK GES.M.B.H

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI