Global Patent Index - EP 1045220 A3

EP 1045220 A3 2001-03-21 - Mine protection for vehicles

Title (en)

Mine protection for vehicles

Title (de)

Minenschutz für Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Protection de véhicules contre les mines

Publication

EP 1045220 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00106497 A

Priority

DE 19913845 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19913845A1] The system for protecting armoured cars and tanks against the effects of mines comprises a protective shield consisting of a steel plate (3), or assembly of plates with a central elastic layer, which is mounted at a distance from the bottom (2) of the vehicle. The central portion of this is unsupported. The mounting for the plate contains an energy absorbing component (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 7/04; F41H 5/013

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/013 (2006.01); F41H 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/042 (2013.01); F41H 5/013 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19913845 A1 20000928; DE 19913845 C2 20020613; EP 1045220 A2 20001018; EP 1045220 A3 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051105

2005-11-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041201

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FR GB IT

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 41H 7/04 A, 7F 41H 5/013 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI