Global Patent Index - EP 1045227 A1

EP 1045227 A1 2000-10-18 - Encoder

Title (en)

Encoder

Title (de)

Kodierer

Title (fr)

Codeur

Publication

EP 1045227 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00108243 A

Priority

  • JP 10946399 A
  • JP 11006799 A

Abstract (en)

An optical type encoder includes a light-emitting element, a scale, a light receiving element for detecting light from the scale when a light beam from the light-emitting element is projected onto the scale, an incremental signal resulting from displacement of the scale being obtained by detection by the light receiving element, two or more mark portions for producing an origin signal formed on the scale, and an origin detecting system for detecting the mark portions for producing the origin signal. The rising position or the falling position of at least one pulse signal indicative of the origin is determined by the detection signals of the two or more mark portions for producing the origin signal by the origin detecting system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01D 5/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01D 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01D 5/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045227 A1 20001018; EP 1045227 B1 20070124; EP 1045227 B2 20120418; DE 60033075 D1 20070315; DE 60033075 T2 20070830; DE 60033075 T3 20120830; US 6674066 B1 20040106

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160501

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160414

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160414

2016-12-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160501

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60033075

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150312

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-25 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-06-14 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60033075

- Effective date: 20120418

2012-04-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20120418

2012-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2008-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DR. JOHANNES HEIDENHAIN GMBH

2007-11-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DR. JOHANNES HEIDENHAIN GMBH

- Effective date: 20071022

2007-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60033075 P 20070315

2007-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2007-01-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050303

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB NL

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI