Global Patent Index - EP 1045235 A2

EP 1045235 A2 2000-10-18 - Method of monitoring torque for spark ignition engines in vehicles

Title (en)

Method of monitoring torque for spark ignition engines in vehicles

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Drehmomentüberwachung bei Otto-Motoren in Kraftfahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Procédé de contrôle de couple pour moteurs à allumage par étincelle dans les véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 1045235 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104750 A

Priority

DE 19916725 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves deriving a reference torque value (M0) from the engine revolution rate (n) and the delivered quantity of air (L), correcting it in homogeneous-lean mode with a signal (lambdaist) from a lambda probe and comparing the corrected value with a driver-specified value (Mmax). A torque-reducing intervention in the engine controller is then performed if the corrected reference torque value rises above the driver-specified value by more than a definable factor.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zur Drehmomentüberwachung bei Otto-Motoren in Kraftfahrzeugen vorgeschlagen, bei dem aus der Drehzahl (n) des Otto-Motors und der zugeführten Luftmasse (L) ein Referenz-Drehmomentwert (M0) abgeleitet wird und dieser Referenz-Drehmomentwert (M0) im Homogen-Mager-Betrieb (Lambda = 1 bis 1,4) durch ein von einem Signal (ist) einer Lambda-Sonde abgeleiteten Signal korrigiert und dann mit einem vom Fahrer vorgegebenen Drehmomentwert (Mmax) verglichen wird. Es werden dann drehmomentabsenkende Eingriffe in die Motorsteuerung vorgenommen, wenn der korrigierte Referenz-Drehmomentwert (M0) den vom Fahrer vorgegebenen Drehmomentwert (Mmax) um einen vorgebbaren Faktor oder Wert übersteigt. Dieses Verfahren ermöglicht eine sichere und exakte Drehmomentüberwachung auch bei Lambda-Werten größer als 1. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01L 5/26; G01M 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/22 (2013.01); F02D 11/107 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1004 (2013.01); F02D 2250/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045235 A2 20001018; EP 1045235 A3 20011031; DE 19916725 A1 20001019; DE 19916725 C2 20011108; US 6332452 B1 20011225

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050323

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-08-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01L 5/26 A, 7G 01M 15/00 B, 7B 60K 28/10 B, 7F 02D 41/22 B, 7F 02D 11/10 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI