Global Patent Index - EP 1045282 A1

EP 1045282 A1 2000-10-18 - Radiographic UV/Blue-sensitive film material and intensifying screen-film combination

Title (en)

Radiographic UV/Blue-sensitive film material and intensifying screen-film combination

Title (de)

UV/Blauempfindlicher Röntgenfilm und Kombination eines Verstärkungsschirms mit einem Film

Title (fr)

Pellicule radiographique sensible dans la région spectrale UV/bleue et structure combinant un film et un écran intensificateur

Publication

EP 1045282 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201192 A

Priority

  • EP 00201192 A
  • EP 99201189 A

Abstract (en)

A film material has been provided with emulsions comprising ä111ü tabular silver halide grains rich in silver bromide, spectrally sensitive to irradiation in the wavelength range shorter than 420 nm by the presence of at least one blue spectral sensitizer and of at least one azacyanine dye, the formula of which has been given in the description and in the claims. A radiographic screen/film combination or system has also been provided comprising a duplitized film sandwiched between a pair of supporting or self-supporting X-ray intensifying screens, characterized in that i) said pair of supported or self-supporting X-ray intensifying screens essentially consists of luminescent phosphor particles emitting at least 50 % and more preferably at least 80 % of their emitted radiation in the wavelength range shorter than 420 nm, ii) said film corresponds with the film material disclosed hereinbefore.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/29; G03C 1/005; G03C 1/12; G03C 5/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/29 (2006.01); G03C 5/17 (2006.01); G03C 1/09 (2006.01); G03C 1/10 (2006.01); G03C 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/0051 (2013.01); G03C 1/29 (2013.01); G03C 5/17 (2013.01); G03C 1/09 (2013.01); G03C 1/102 (2013.01); G03C 1/122 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G03C 1/0051 + G03C 2200/03 + G03C 2001/03511 + G03C 2001/0055
  2. G03C 1/09 + G03C 2001/091 + G03C 2001/096 + G03C 2001/097

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045282 A1 20001018; EP 1045282 B1 20021016

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120330

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60000592

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120330

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110211

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000592 20021121

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2002-10-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-16 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020411

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI