Global Patent Index - EP 1045283 A1

EP 1045283 A1 2000-10-18 - Radiation-sensitive emulsion, light-sensitive silver halide photographic film material and radiographic intensifying screen-film combination

Title (en)

Radiation-sensitive emulsion, light-sensitive silver halide photographic film material and radiographic intensifying screen-film combination

Title (de)

Strahlungsempfindliche Emulsion, lichtempfindlicher photographischer Silberhalogenidfilm und Kombination eines radiographischen Verstärkungsschirms mit einem Film

Title (fr)

Emulsion sensible aux radiation, film photographique à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumiére et structure radiographique combinant un film et un écran intensificateur

Publication

EP 1045283 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99201190 A

Priority

EP 99201190 A

Abstract (en)

A spectrally-sensitized emulsion has been described, wherein said emulsion comprises ä111ü tabular silver halide grains having an average aspect ratio of at least 2 with two flat parallel ä111ü crystal faces accounting for a total projective surface of said parallel crystal faces in said emulsion of at least 50 %, characterized in that a site-directing compound is present at said faces, satisfying the general formula I as described herein is present. A light-sensitive silver halide photographic film material comprising a support and on one or both sides thereof at least one light-sensitive emulsion layer having an emulsion as disclosed has also been described as well as a radiographic screen/film combination comprising such a light-sensitive silver halide photographic film material and a supporting or self-supporting X-ray intensifying screen, characterized in that said supported or self-supporting X-ray intensifying screen essentially consists of luminescent phosphor particles emitting green light.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/29; G03C 1/005; G03C 1/07; G03C 1/12; G03C 5/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21K 4/00 (2006.01); G03C 1/00 (2006.01); G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/07 (2006.01); G03C 1/12 (2006.01); G03C 1/46 (2006.01); G03C 5/17 (2006.01); G03C 1/005 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/122 (2013.01); G03C 1/07 (2013.01); G03C 5/17 (2013.01); G03C 1/0051 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G03C 1/0051 + G03C 2200/03 + G03C 2001/03511 + G03C 2001/0055 + G03C 2007/3025
  2. G03C 1/0051 + G03C 2200/03 + G03C 2001/03511 + G03C 2001/0055
  3. G03C 5/17 + G03C 2007/3025

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045283 A1 20001018; EP 1045283 B1 20020123; DE 69900812 D1 20020314; JP 2000321701 A 20001124

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090416

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090416

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-01-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-05-01 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20020405

2002-04-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900812 20020314

2002-02-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI