Global Patent Index - EP 1045297 A1

EP 1045297 A1 2000-10-18 - Coaxial lever escapement

Title (en)

Coaxial lever escapement

Title (de)

Koaxiale Ankerhemmung

Title (fr)

Echappement coaxial à ancre

Publication

EP 1045297 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99107164 A

Priority

EP 99107164 A

Abstract (en)

Coaxial release anchor (1) has first (12) and second (13) rest blades. Each blade is made from a single stone and engages in groove (14) machined in the anchor. Each blade stone rises above the level of the release anchor (1) so that it meshes in the te (8) of a second release wheel (3). The anchor itself is in the same plane as first release wheel (1).

Abstract (fr)

L'ancre (1) de l'échappement coaxial est munie de première (12) et seconde (13) palettes de repos. Chacune de ces palettes est faite d'une pierre monobloc engagée dans une rainure (14) pratiquée dans l'ancre (1). Chaque pierre dépasse une des faces planes (15) de l'ancre et présente une hauteur (h) propre à la mettre au niveau de la seconde roue d'échappement (3) pour coopérer avec les dents (8) de ladite seconde roue, l'ancre proprement dite se trouvant au niveau de la première roue d'échappement (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 15/08; G04B 15/06; G04B 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 15/08 (2006.01); G04B 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 15/14 (2013.01); G04B 15/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • EP 0018796 B1 19841107
  • SCRIPTAR S.A., LA CONVERSION: "La Montre : Principes et Méthodes de Fabrication", 1993, LA CONVERSION, LAUSANNE, 1993, article G. DANIELS, pages: 249 - 252

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045297 A1 20001018; EP 1045297 B1 20030702; CN 1188754 C 20050209; CN 1270331 A 20001018; DE 69909236 D1 20030807; DE 69909236 T2 20040422; HK 1032120 A1 20051007; JP 2000304874 A 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090412

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080409

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909236 P 20030807

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI