Global patent index - EP 1045321 A2

EP 1045321 A2 2000-10-18 - Information processing apparatus and method, management apparatus and method, and providing medium

Title (en)

Information processing apparatus and method, management apparatus and method, and providing medium

Title (de)

Apparat und Verfahren zur Informationsverarbeitung und Verwaltung und Medium zum Ausliefern

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé pour le traitement et la gestion d'informations et médium pour la livraison

Publication

EP 1045321 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00303049 A

Priority

JP 10399199 A

Abstract (en)

Marketing information can be provided. Fig. 60 shows singers of contents (music) purchased in a predetermined period in decreasing order of purchase count. Such marketing information can be provided to the user, content provider, and service provider. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09C 1/00 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06F 21/10 (2013.01); G06Q 10/00 (2012.01); G06Q 30/02 (2012.01); G06Q 30/04 (2012.01); G06Q 30/06 (2012.01); G06Q 50/00 (2012.01); G06Q 50/10 (2012.01); G11B 20/10 (2006.01); H04L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045321 A2 20001018; EP 1045321 A3 20030702; JP 2000293588 A 20001020

INPADOC legal status

2006-08-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20060623

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI