Global patent index - EP 1045349 A1

EP 1045349 A1 2000-10-18 - A cassette locking mechanism

Title (en)

A cassette locking mechanism

Title (de)

Schliessmechanismus für eine Kassette

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de verrouillage pour une cassette

Publication

EP 1045349 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00301659 A

Priority

SE 9900810 A

Abstract (en)

A lock mechanism (2) for a cassette (1) that is intended to be inserted into and removed from a banknote handling machine while in a locked state, wherein when the cassette (1) is inserted into the machine with a lid (15) of said cassette closed and locked, the cassette lid (15) is released by automatic actuation from elements (16,212, 142) in said machine and said lock mechanism (2) and raised as a result of the coaction between elements (152,153) on the lid (15) and in the machine, and wherein when the cassette (1) is removed from the machine the cassette lid (15) is closed as a result of corresponding coaction between said elements (152,153) and is locked by corresponding actuation from said elements (16,212,142) in the machine and said lock mechanism. The lock mechanism (2) includes on an inside (12) of the cassette (1) a rotor (22) which can be actuated by elements (232,233) in the lock mechanism, and a sealable turning device (225) provided on an outside (12') of the cassette (1). Said turning device can be turned from outside said cassette to mechanically actuate said rotor. The turning device (225) can not be actuated by movements of the rotor (22) during said actuation by means of the elements (232,233) in the lock mechanism (2). The rotor (22) can be actuated by the turning device (225) outside the cassette to reset the rotor (22) to a state in which the cassette (1) can be inserted into the machine with the lid (15) of the cassette closed and locked. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 11/00; B65H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/02 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/025 (2013.01); G07D 11/0009 (2013.01); B65H 2402/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045349 A1 20001018; CN 1283729 A 20010214; SE 513791 C2 20001106; SE 9900810 D0 19990308; SE 9900810 L 20000909

INPADOC legal status

2002-06-26 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020201

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010305

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI