Global Patent Index - EP 1045353 A2

EP 1045353 A2 2000-10-18 - Photocell

Title (en)

Photocell

Title (de)

Photozelle

Title (fr)

Cellule photoélectrique

Publication

EP 1045353 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00107054 A

Priority

IT TV990019 U

Abstract (en)

A photocell comprising a box-like body (2) constituted by a first half-shell (3) and by a second half-shell (4) which can be mutually coupled. Inside the first half-shell (3) there is a support (10), for example for a light source (11), which rotates about a first vertical axis. The light source (11) in turn selectively rotates on a second axis which is perpendicular to the first axis. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/183

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/183 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/183 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045353 A2 20001018; EP 1045353 A3 20010411; EP 1045353 B1 20040616; AT 269568 T 20040715; DE 60011505 D1 20040722; IT 248101 Y1 20021210; IT TV990019 U1 20001016; IT TV990019 V0 19990416

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100404

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040927

2004-09-17 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60011505 P 20040722

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT

2004-06-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR IT

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI