Global Patent Index - EP 1045360 A1

EP 1045360 A1 2000-10-18 - Process for operating a light sign arrangement

Title (en)

Process for operating a light sign arrangement

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Lichtzeichenanlage

Title (fr)

Procédé de fonctionnement d'un appareil de signalisation lumineuse

Publication

EP 1045360 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107259 A

Priority

EP 99107259 A

Abstract (en)

The operating method has the traffic signal lamps for controlling the traffic flow across the railway crossing controlled by a microcomputer, so that a red signal is provided when the approach of a tram or train is detected. The voltage supply for the latter red signal (Rr) is monitored via the lights operating control (SVA), to allow separation of the traffic signal lamps for the railway crossing from the traffic junction signal lamps and supply of the red signal from an independent voltage source.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Lichtzeichenanlage zur Steuerung des Straßenverkehrs an Kreuzungen zwischen mindestens einer Straße (NS) und mindestens einem Schienenstrang (SS) im Bereich einer Straßenkreuzung oder Straßeneinmündung mit einer Lichtsignalanlage für den Straßenbereich und einer Lichtsignalanlage für die Sicherung des Bahnüberganges (BÜ). Um den Aufwand für die zusätzliche Lichtsignalanlage zur Sicherung des Bahnüberganges (BÜ) zu vermeiden, dienen die relevanten Rotsignale (Rr) der Lichtanlage für den Straßenbereich ebenfalls zur Sicherung des Bahnüberganges (BÜ). Diese Rotsignale (Rr) werden jeweils durch einen Mikrocomputer gesteuert, der bei Annäherung eines Schienenfahrzeuges die Spannungsversorgung des Rotsignals (Rr) durch die Steuerung (SVA) der Lichtsignalanlage für den Straßenbereich überwacht und bei fehlender Spannung die Verbindung des Rotsignals (Rr) mit der Steuerung (SVA) trennt und das Rotsignal (Rr) mit Spannung einer von der Lichtsignalanlage für den Straßenbereich unabhängigen Spannungsquelle versorgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/097; B61L 29/24; G08G 1/095

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 29/24 (2006.01); G08G 1/095 (2006.01); G08G 1/097 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 29/24 (2013.01); G08G 1/095 (2013.01); G08G 1/097 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045360 A1 20001018; EP 1045360 B1 20040714; DE 59909957 D1 20040819; DK 1045360 T3 20041122

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100414

2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100503

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2010-12-13 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-11-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101101

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090415

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090415

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2004-11-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909957 P 20040819

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK LU NL

2004-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 08G 1/097 A

2004-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 08G 1/095 B

2004-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 61L 29/24 B

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK LU NL

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991113

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK LU NL

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI