Global Patent Index - EP 1045401 A1

EP 1045401 A1 2000-10-18 - Flame-resistant cable

Title (en)

Flame-resistant cable

Title (de)

Flammbeständiges Kabel

Title (fr)

cable resistant aux flammes

Publication

EP 1045401 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99400932 A

Priority

EP 99400932 A

Abstract (en)

The cable has a core (1) with at least one plastic-insulated conductor and/or at least one light waveguide (1b) and an outer casing (2c) with a metal pipe enclosing the core. There is an inner casing (2a) between the core and the outer casing consisting a densely packed flame-retardant plastic.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem flammbeständigen Kabel, welches der Flammausbreitung und der Rauchentwicklung widersteht, mit einer Seele (1), die mindestens einen kunststoffisolierten Leiter und/oder mindestens einen Lichtwellenleiter (1b) aufweist und mit einem Außenmantel, ist der Außenmantel (2c) ein Metallrohr, welches die Seele (1) umhüllt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/295

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/295 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/295 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045401 A1 20001018; EP 1045401 B1 20061115; DE 59913983 D1 20061228; ES 2275331 T3 20070601

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-07-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DRAKA COMTEQ B.V.

2007-06-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DRAKA COMTEQ B.V.

2007-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2275331 T3

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070215

2007-02-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070122

2006-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913983 P 20061228

2006-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2006-11-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061115

2005-09-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DRAKA COMTEQ B.V.

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020719

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990929

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI