Global Patent Index - EP 1045407 A1

EP 1045407 A1 2000-10-18 - High-voltage transformer

Title (en)

High-voltage transformer

Title (de)

Hochspannungstransformator

Title (fr)

Transformateur à haute tension

Publication

EP 1045407 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00106550 A

Priority

  • EP 00106550 A
  • EP 99106932 A

Abstract (en)

The high-voltage transformer comprises a core (K), a primary winding (W1), a high-voltage winding (WH) arranged in a coil former (3), and a housing (1), whereat the primary winding (W1) is arranged at the outside of the housing (1). The housing (1) is preferably cylindrical with wall-like juts (2) between which the primary winding (W1) is wound, said juts (2) especially placed at each side of the housing (1). The primary winding (W1) can arranged as a dense winding at the outside of the housing which covers essentially the high voltage winding (WH) to shield the high voltage winding (WH) electrically. Auxiliary windings for providing low supply voltages can be placed also outside together with the primary winding (W1). The transformer comprises only two plastic parts which requires less production steps and less material. Because primary and auxiliary windings are placed outside the housing the volume of the housing is much reduced and therefore much less resin is required to fill up the high-voltage transformer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 38/42; H01F 27/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/36 (2006.01); H01F 38/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/367 (2013.01); H01F 38/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045407 A1 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080528

2007-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070105

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI