Global Patent Index - EP 1045416 A3

EP 1045416 A3 2001-12-12 - Electromagnetic trip device for an electrical circuit breaker

Title (en)

Electromagnetic trip device for an electrical circuit breaker

Title (de)

Elektromagnetischer Auslöser für ein elektrisches Schaltgerät

Title (fr)

Déclencheur électromagnétique pour un disjoncteur électrique

Publication

EP 1045416 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00106375 A

Priority

DE 19915785 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1045416A2] A plate (14) is situated on free sides of a U shaped yoke of a magnet (11) for the release of the plate (14) of an armature connected with the magnetic core (41). With occurrence of an overcurrent the disk armature pulls against the plate and releases switching lock. In case of short-circuit current, the magnetic armature (20) opens due to a strike of a pin (30) onto a contact location (33).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/24; H01H 71/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/24 (2006.01); H01H 71/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/2409 (2013.01); H01H 71/2454 (2013.01); H01H 71/2463 (2013.01); H01H 71/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19915785 A1 20001012; EP 1045416 A2 20001018; EP 1045416 A3 20011212; PL 339480 A1 20001009

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000401

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000401

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000401