Global patent index - EP 1045417 A2

EP 1045417 A2 2000-10-18 - Plug-in fuse assembly

Title (en)

Plug-in fuse assembly

Title (de)

Aufstecksicherung

Title (fr)

Fusible embrochable

Publication

EP 1045417 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104796 A

Priority

DE 19911852 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19911852A1] The housing is formed as a switch frame (1) while a contact fork (2) protrudes from and is arranged on the switch frame (1). A pick-up contact (9) is situated at the open side of the switch frame (1) of a detachable switching lid (5). A holding device is connected with grip link (19) of the branch fuse insert (3) on suspension pad (20).

Abstract (de)

Eine Aufstecksicherung ist in elektrischen Kontakt mit dem Kontaktmesser (29) eines Hauptsicherungseinsatzes eines Spannungsverteilersystems bringbar und weist ein Gehäuse (1) auf, an dessen einem, abgangsseitigen Ende eine Abgangsklemme und an dessen anderem, zugangsseitigen Ende ein Kontaktelement (9) und dazwischen ein Abzweigsicherungseinsatz (3) vorgesehen sind. Damit die Kontaktierung zuverlässiger gestaltet wird und beim Zu- oder Abschalten das Kontaktmesser nicht durch Lichtbögen oder dergleichen beschädigt wird, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß das Gehäuse (1) als Schaltergestell (1) etwa in der Form eines zur Sichtseite hin wenigstens teilweise offenen Kastens ausgebildet ist, eine aus dem Schaltergestell (1) herausstehende und am Schaltergestell (1) angeordnete Kontaktgabel (2) mit einem Aufnahmekontakt (9) als Kontaktelement verbunden ist und daß die offene Seite des Schaltergestelles (1) von einem Schaltdeckel (5) abdeckbar ist, der am Schaltergestell (1) lösbar über Haltemittel angeordnet ist, über Aufhängeteile (20) mit Grifflaschen (19) des Abzweigsicherungseinsatzes (3) verbunden ist und in dem der Abzweigsicherungseinsatz (3) befestigt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 85/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/02 (2013.01); H01H 2085/206 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911852 A1 20000921; DE 19911852 B4 20071213; EP 1045417 A2 20001018; EP 1045417 A3 20020206; PL 339033 A1 20000925

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-11-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI