Global Patent Index - EP 1045466 A1

EP 1045466 A1 2000-10-18 - Collector, electrode, and secondary battery adopting the same

Title (en)

Collector, electrode, and secondary battery adopting the same

Title (de)

Stromkollektor, Elektrode und diesen Stromkollektor enthaltende Sekundärbatterie

Title (fr)

Collecteur, électrode et batterie secondaire l'utilisant

Publication

EP 1045466 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00303126 A

Priority

KR 19990013488 A

Abstract (en)

A collector (111), an electrode (100) and a secondary battery adopting the same. The secondary battery includes: an electrode assembly (100) having electrodes obtained by attaching an active material sheet (115) to at least one side of a flat collector (111) with a plurality of through holes (112) formed in a predetermined pattern, and a separator (130) interposed between the electrodes; a case (140) for sealing the electrode assembly; and tabs connected to terminals of the electrode assembly and extended outwards the case, wherein the through holes (112) have a regular polygonal shape and the rib widths among the through holes are equal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 4/72; H01M 4/02; H01M 4/66; H01M 4/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01M 4/70 (2006.01); H01M 4/02 (2006.01); H01M 4/04 (2006.01); H01M 4/66 (2006.01); H01M 4/72 (2006.01); H01M 4/74 (2006.01); H01M 10/05 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 4/742 (2013.01); H01M 4/02 (2013.01); H01M 4/661 (2013.01); H01M 4/72 (2013.01); H01M 4/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045466 A1 20001018; EP 1045466 B1 20080813; CN 1171338 C 20041013; CN 1272699 A 20001108; DE 60039811 D1 20080925; JP 2000311693 A 20001107; JP 4406149 B2 20100127; KR 100329560 B1 20020320; KR 20000066405 A 20001115; US 6399253 B1 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160405

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-07-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090514

2008-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60039811 P 20080925

2008-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020405

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020405

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI