Global Patent Index - EP 1045470 A2

EP 1045470 A2 2000-10-18 - Bandpass filter with multiple coaxial cavities

Title (en)

Bandpass filter with multiple coaxial cavities

Title (de)

Mehrkreisiges Bandfilter aus Topfkreisen

Title (fr)

Filtre passe-bande à cavités coaxiales multiples

Publication

EP 1045470 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103911 A

Priority

DE 19916605 A

Abstract (en)

The filter has coupled cavity resonators, of which at least two that are not in series for HF signals are connected for negative feedback via connectors inserted into each resonator. The cavity resonators are arranged so that at least the negatively coupled ones bound on each other and the conductor is in the form of a loop (21) protruding into one resonator that is connected through a slot (41) in the dividing wall (40) of the bounding resonator to a strut (22) in the other resonator.

Abstract (de)

Ein mehrkreisiges Bandfilter aus miteinander gekoppelten Topfkreisen, von denen mindestens zwei gegengekoppelt sind, ist für große HF-Leistungen ohne unzulässige Erwärmung im Gegenkopplungszweig einsetzbar, wenn die Topfkreise so angeordnet sind, daß zumindest die gegenzukoppelnden Topfkreise mechanisch benachbart liegen, und wenn die Gegenkopplung als in den einen Topfkreis eintauchende Schleife (21) ausgebildet ist, die durch einen in der Trennwand (40) zu dem benachbarten Topfkreis ausgebildeten Schlitz (41) hindurch mit einem Stempel (22) in dem anderen Topfkreis verbunden ist. Die Schleife und der Stempel bilden zweckmäßig ein einheitliches Leitungsstück, dessen Eintauchtiefe in die Topfkreise veränderbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/205

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/205 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/2053 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045470 A2 20001018; EP 1045470 A3 20011107; EP 1045470 B1 20040303; DE 19916605 C1 20010118; ES 2215503 T3 20041016

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140224

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140225

2015-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150504

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140225

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-09-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-03-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2006-03-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215503 T3

2004-03-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT SE

2002-08-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR IT SE

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT SE

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI