Global patent index - EP 1045473 A2

EP 1045473 A2 2000-10-18 - Multibeam phased array antenna system

Title (en)

Multibeam phased array antenna system

Title (de)

Multibeam-Phasenarray-Antenneneinrichtung

Title (fr)

Système d'alignement en phase pour antenne multibeam

Publication

EP 1045473 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105188 A

Priority

DE 19917202 A

Abstract (en)

The antenna arrangement has radiator elements (SE1...) in a matrix, each driven by beam shaping devices (BFN), a number of signal dividers corresponding to the number of transmitted or received signals, beam shaping devices arranged in a bounded path after each radiator element and connected to the signal dividers via multiple connections and a signal combiner per line of beam shapers via which the radiator elements can be coupled directly or if appropriate via an amplifier (VS1...) and/or filter (Fi1...).

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Multibeam-Phasenarray-Antenneneinrichtung sind Strahlformeinrichtungen (BFN) jeweils in abgegrenzten Strängen hinter jeweils einem Strahlerelement (SE1...SEm) vorgesehen in Abhängigkeit der Anzahl der einspeisbaren/abnehmbaren Antennensignale. Pro Strang von Strahlformeinrichtungen (BFN) ist jeweils ein Signalkombinator (SK) vorgesehen. Signalteilungseinrichtungen (VR1...VRn) zur Ansteuerung der Strahlformeinrichtungen sind vorzugsweise auf der Rückseite der Schaltungsträgersubstrate (SU) für die Strahlformeinrichtungen (BFN)aufgebracht, um einen Kompaktaufbau zu ermöglichen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 21/00; H01Q 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/26 (2006.01); H01Q 21/00 (2006.01); H01Q 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/0025 (2013.01); H01Q 3/26 (2013.01); H01Q 25/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1045473 A2 20001018; EP 1045473 A3 20010411; DE 19917202 A1 20001019; US 6362780 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061111

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060630

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TESAT-SPACECOM GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI